IL HB4481 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Prohibits a political committee from making certain expenditures to provide a defense in any criminal case or a defense in a civil case pertaining to misconduct by a person in his or her capacity as a public official, sexual harassment claims, or discrimination claims. Requires that a person found to have used campaign contributions in violation of the Code shall return contributions to the contributor or pay to the State if the contributor cannot be identified or reimbursed. Requires the political committee to include information on the contributions returned to the contributor or paid to the State in the committee's quarterly report to the State Board of Elections.
Title
ELEC CD-USE OF FUNDS
Sponsors
Rep. Deanne Mazzochi [R] | Sen. Andrew Chesney [R] | Rep. Grant Wehrli [R] | Rep. Amy Grant [R] |
Rep. Mark Batinick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2020-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2020-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2020-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 9-33 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 9-8.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4481&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4481.htm |