IL HB4490 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-3)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Child Care Act of 1969. Requires specified personnel of a child care facility to be present at the open or close of the facility. Provides that early childhood teachers shall meet specified qualifications. Provides that the Department of Children and Family Services shall adopt rules on the qualifications of persons directly responsible for the care and welfare of children served in accordance with the qualifications for early childhood teachers. Effective immediately.
Title
EARLY CHILDHOOD TEACHER-QUALIF
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2020-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2020-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2020-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2020-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2020-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2020-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2020-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2020-02-11 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Darren Bailey |
2020-02-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2020-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2020-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2020-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nathan D. Reitz |
2020-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 10 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 10 | 6.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 10 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4490&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4490.htm |