IL HB4506 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Private Detective, Private Alarm, Private Security, Fingerprint Vendor, and Locksmith Act of 2004. In a provision requiring training for registered employees of a private detective agency within 30 days of their employment, specifies that the training may be classroom-based or online Internet-based and removes certain topics that must be included in that training. Provides that registered employees of a private detective agency, private detectives, and private security contractors shall complete an additional 8 hours of annual training each calendar year. Provides that the annual training for registered employees shall be based on subjects related to the work performed and may be conducted in a classroom or seminar setting or through Internet-based online learning programs. Provides that the annual training for private detectives and private security contractors shall be on a topic of their choosing, provided that the subject matter is reasonably related to their private detective or private security contractor practice. Specifies that the annual training for private detectives may be completed utilizing any combination of hours obtained in a formal educational classroom setting or Internet-based online training resources. Specifies that a minimum of 4 hours of the annual training for private security contractors must be completed in a formal educational classroom setting. Makes changes to provisions concerning employer certification of training. Requires private detectives and private security officers to keep and maintain a personal log of all training hours earned with sufficient documentation to verify the annual training was completed for at least 5 years. Makes other changes.
Title
PRIVATE DETECTIVE-TRAINING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2020-03-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2020-03-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-03-04 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 026-003-000 |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John Connor |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 447 | 15-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 447 | 25-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4506&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4506.htm |