IL HB4526 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends various acts relating to the governance of public universities in Illinois. Removes the requirement that employees of an Illinois college or university must have been employed for an aggregate period of at least 7 years by any one or more than one Illinois college or university for the children of employees to be eligible for a 50% tuition waiver for undergraduate education. Adds the requirement that employees of an Illinois college or university must be employed by an Illinois college or university at the time of enrollment for the child to be eligible for a 50% tuition waiver for undergraduate education. Provides that for an employee's child to remain eligible for a partial tuition waiver, the employee must continue to be employed by an Illinois college or university throughout the duration of the child's enrollment or until the child has expended 4 years of undergraduate partial tuition waiver benefits.
Title
SCH CD-PARTIAL TUITION WAIVERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 305 | 7f | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 520 | 8f | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 660 | 5-90 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 665 | 10-90 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 670 | 15-90 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 675 | 20-90 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 680 | 25-90 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 685 | 30-90 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 690 | 35-90 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4526&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4526.htm |