IL HB4528 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State's Attorney Division of the Counties Code. Provides that, in a county with less than 2,000,000 inhabitants, the State's Attorney may give an opinion, without fee or reward, upon any question of law relating to a County Veterans Assistance Commission. Provides that a County Veterans Assistance Commission may make such a request of the State's Attorney, and the State's Attorney, in the State's Attorney's sole discretion, may grant or decline such a request by a County Veterans Assistance Commission. Makes all provisions of the Division gender neutral. Effective immediately.
Title
STATE'S ATTORNEY-LEGAL OPINION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 3-9001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 3-9002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 3-9004 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 3-9005 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 3-9006 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 3-9008 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 3-9009 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 3-9012 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4528&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4528.htm |