IL HB4622 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Driver Education Act of the School Code. Requires the State Board of Education to adopt course content standards for the classroom and laboratory phases of driver education for novice teen drivers under the age of 18 years based on the national Novice Teen Driver Education and Training Administrative Standards (rather than requiring the State Board, in consultation with the Secretary of State, to adopt course content standards for driver education for those persons under the age of 18 years). Provides that the course content standards shall include the cognitive, physiological, and psychological aspects of operating a motor vehicle (rather than the operation and equipment of motor vehicles).
Title
SCH CD-DRIVER ED STANDARDS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael Halpin |
2020-03-03 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael Halpin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 27-24.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |