IL HB4623 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Compassionate Use of Medical Cannabis Program Act. Provides that employers are not prohibited from adopting specified policies concerning medical cannabis by registered qualifying patients, including drug testing policies for such patients working in safety sensitive positions. Unless specified circumstances are met, prohibits employers from taking adverse action against registered qualifying patients who work in non-safety sensitive positions solely due to a positive drug test for medicinal cannabis. Defines "safety sensitive position". Provides that there is not a cause of action for any person against an employer for disciplining or terminating the employment of a registered qualifying patient when enforcing a compliant policy. Makes other changes. Amends the Right to Privacy in the Workplace Act. Provides that the amendatory Act's provisions are an exception to provisions prohibiting an employer from refusing to hire or to discharge or disadvantage any individual because the individual uses lawful products off the premises of the employer during nonworking and non-call hours. Effective immediately.
Title
COMPASSIONATE USE-LIABILITY
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Morgan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 023-000-000 |
2020-02-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
2020-02-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 130 | 50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 55 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |