IL HB4663 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning instruction.
Title
EDUCATION-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 27-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |