IL HB4692 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-8)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-25 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-25 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Practice Act of 1987. Provides that a physician licensed to practice medicine in all its branches may collaborate with a physician assistant if specified requirements are met for a collaborative agreement. Provides that a collaborative agreement shall be for services in the same area of practice or specialty as the collaborating physician in his or her clinical medical practice. Amends the Physician Assistant Practice Act of 1987. Deletes language requiring a collaborative agreement to be written for a physician assistant and changes requirements for the collaborative agreement. Provides that medical care provided by a physician assistant shall be consistent with the physician assistant's education, training, and experience. Makes changes to provisions concerning prescriptive authority of a physician assistant. Provides that in a hospital, hospital affiliate, or ambulatory surgical treatment center, the medical staff (instead of the attending physician) shall determine a physician assistant's role in providing care for patients. Changes the physician assistant advisory committee to the Physician Assistant Medical Licensing Board. Changes the membership and duties of the Board. Removes provisions concerning initial terms of office for Board members. Makes conforming and other changes. Effective January 1, 2021.
Title
PHYSICIAN ASSISTANTS-VARIOUS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2020-08-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2020-03-03 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2020-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva Dina Delgado |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2020-02-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2020-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 60 | 54.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 95 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 95 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 95 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 95 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 95 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 95 | 7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 95 | 7.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4692&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4692.htm |