IL HB4725 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Practice Act of 1987. Provides that not later than 12 months after the effective date of the amendatory Act, the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation shall adopt rules that require a person seeking licensure to practice medicine in all of its branches to have completed 6 hours of education on the diagnosis, treatment, and care of individuals with cognitive impairments, including, but not limited to, Alzheimer's disease and other dementias. Provides that no later than 12 months after the effective date of the amendatory Act, the Department shall adopt rules that require any continuing education for persons licensed to practice medicine under all of its branches under the Act to include an average of 2 hours of continuing education per license year on the diagnosis, treatment and care of individuals with cognitive impairments, including, but not limited to, Alzheimer's disease and other dementias. Specifies that the training requirement shall only apply to persons who serve adult populations. Provides that the curriculum used for the training shall cover the diagnosis of Alzheimer's disease and other dementias, including recognizing the signs and symptoms of dementia; person-centered care; assessment and care planning; and culturally competent health care.
Title
PHYSICIANS-DEMENTIA TRAINING
Sponsors
Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] | Rep. Fred Crespo [D] | Rep. Natalie Manley [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] |
Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2020-03-03 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 60 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 60 | 20.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4725&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4725.htm |