IL HB4730 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Identification Card Act and the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Secretary of State may provide by rule for the issuance of an Illinois Identification Card or driver's license to an applicant that depicts the applicant wearing a religious head dressing; however, the Secretary shall not require such an applicant to sign an affidavit stating that he or she, in observation of a religious conviction, wears the head dressing at all times when in public.
Title
ID CARDS-RELIGIOUS HEAD DRESS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 335 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4730&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4730.htm |