IL HB4791 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Relocates a provision regarding special immigrant minors from the Abused, Neglected, or Dependent Minors Article to the General Provisions Article. Amends the Probate Act of 1975. Provides that a petition for guardianship of the person of a minor who is 18 years of age or older, but who has not yet attained 21 years of age, may be filed by a parent, relative, or nonrelative person over the age of 21. Provides that a court making determinations concerning such a petition shall consider the best interest of the minor. Provides that an appointed guardian shall have responsibility for the custody, nurture, and tuition of the minor, and shall have the right to determine the minor's residence based on the minor's best interest. Provides that a minor who is the subject of a petition for guardianship or for extension of guardianship may be referred for psychological, educational, medical, or social services under certain circumstances. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
MINORS-JUV CT-PROBATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-03-04 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-005-000 |
2020-03-04 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2020-03-04 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 006-003-000 |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2020-02-26 | House | To Family Law Subcommittee |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 405 | 1-4.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
705 | 405 | 2-4a | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
755 | 5 | 11-5.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4791&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4791.htm |