IL HB4818 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Adult Protective Services Act. Requires the Department on Aging to develop and implement a dementia training program that must include instruction on the identification of people with dementia, risks such as wandering, communication impairments, elder abuse, and the best practices for interacting with people with dementia. Provides that initial training of 4 hours shall be completed at the start of employment with the Adult Protective Services division and shall cover several subjects, including: (i) dementia, psychiatric, and behavioral symptoms; (ii) communication issues, including how to communicate respectfully and effectively; and (iii) protocols for connecting people living with dementia to local care resources and professionals who are skilled in dementia care to encourage cross-referral and reporting regarding incidents of abuse. Provides that annual continuing education shall include 2 hours of dementia training covering the same subjects discussed during initial training. Grants the Department rulemaking authority.
Title
ADULT PROTECTIVE SERVICES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2020-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2020-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4818&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4818.htm |