IL HB4824 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987, the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963, and the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that the court may, upon request, allow a witness to forgo testifying in person and may allow testimony by means of two-way audio-visual communication, including closed circuit television or computerized video conference, if the court finds that there is reasonable cause to believe that the in-person testimony of the witness may result in the deportation of the witness. Provides that all two-way electronic testimony shall be conducted in accordance with rules adopted by the Illinois Supreme Court. Provides that if, for any reason, the court determines on its own motion or on the motion of any party that the conduct of two-way electronic testimony may impair the legal rights of the minor alleged to be delinquent, the defendant, or in civil cases, any party to the case, it shall not permit the two-way electronic testimony to proceed.
Title
WITNESS-CLOSED CIRCUIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 405 | 5-602 | New Code | See Bill Text |
725 | 5 | 106D-2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
735 | 5 | 2-1102.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4824&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4824.htm |