IL HB4840 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act and the Service Use Tax Act. Provides that the demonstration use or interim use of tangible personal property purchased for resale is exempt for a period of 18 months after the retailer or serviceman purchases the tangible personal property for resale. Provides that, if the period of demonstration use or interim use exceeds 18 months, the retailer or serviceman shall pay tax on the original cost price. Effective immediately.
Title
USE TAX-DEMONSTRATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 105 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |