IL HB4854 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Provides that the chairperson of the county board may appoint, with the advice and consent of the county board, an outside attorney to serve as legal counsel to the county board. The chairperson may choose the State's Attorney as legal counsel who shall receive additional compensation as appropriate. Provides that the chairperson, by written order filed with the county clerk, may discontinue the appointment of the outside counsel appointed and prevents compensation to the outside counsel after the discontinuance. Provides that the duty of a State's Attorney to be legal counsel are in addition to the statutory duties of the State's Attorney and the State's Attorney shall not receive additional compensation for the duties performed.
Title
COUNTY BD/CHAIR LEGAL COUNSEL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-03 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael Halpin |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4854&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4854.htm |