IL HB4917 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that the definition of "consumer debt" does not include any money due or owing, or alleged to be due or owing, from a natural person for an arrearage of child support. Provides that the definition of "consumer debt judgment" does not include any judgment entered for an arrearage of child support.
Title
CONSUMER DEBT-CHILD SUPPORT
Sponsors
Rep. Margo McDermed [R] | Rep. Kelly Burke [D] | Rep. Ann Williams [D] | Rep. Will Guzzardi [D] |
Rep. Andre Thapedi [D] | Rep. Deanne Mazzochi [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-03-04 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 014-000-000 |
2020-03-04 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2020-03-04 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 006-000-000 |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2020-02-26 | House | To Commercial Law Subcommittee |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 2-1303 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4917&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4917.htm |