IL HB4947 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva Dina Delgado
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva Dina Delgado
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, in counties with 3,000,000 or more inhabitants, taxpayers of income producing property shall submit income and expense data annually to the chief county assessment officer on or before July 1 of each year. Provides that, in counties of fewer than 3,000,000 inhabitants, the county board may provide by ordinance or resolution that taxpayers of income-producing property shall submit income and expense data annually to the chief county assessment officer on or before March 31 of each year. Contains certain exceptions. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-INCOME PROPERTY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva Dina Delgado |
2020-07-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2020-03-03 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 9-280 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 9-281 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 9-6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4947&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4947.htm |