IL HB4957 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. In provisions concerning self-distribution exemptions for certain wine manufacturers, provides that those wine manufacturers may not be granted a self-distribution exemption if they are part of an affiliated group producing more than 25,000 gallons of wine, 930,000 gallons of beer, or 50,000 gallons of spirits (instead of 25,000 gallons of wine or any other liquor). Provides that a class 1 craft distiller may not be a member of or affiliated with, directly or indirectly, a manufacturer that produces more than 50,000 gallons of spirits per year, 930,000 gallons of beer per year, or 25,000 gallons of wine per year (instead of 50,000 gallons of spirits per year or any other alcoholic liquor). Provides that a class 2 craft distiller may not be a member of or affiliated with, directly or indirectly, a manufacturer that produces more than 50,000 gallons of spirits per year, 3,720,000 gallons of beer per year, or 25,000 gallons of wine per year (instead of 100,000 gallons of spirits per year or any other alcoholic liquor). Provides that a class 1 brewer may not be a member of or affiliated with a manufacturer that produces more than 930,000 gallons of beer per year, 50,000 gallons of spirits per year, or 25,000 gallons of wine per year (instead of 930,000 gallons of beer per year or any other alcoholic liquor). Provides that class 2 brewers may not be a member of or affiliated with a manufacturer that produces more than 3,720,000 gallons of beer per year, 100,000 gallons of spirits per year, or 25,000 gallons of wine per year (instead of 3,720,000 gallons of beer per year or any other alcoholic liquor). Makes related changes in provisions concerning brew pub licensees, distilling pub licensees, and self-distribution exemptions. Effective immediately.
Title
LIQUOR-MANUFACTURERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
235 | 5 | 3-12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
235 | 5 | 5-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4957&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4957.htm |