IL HB4978 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Probate Act of 1975. Provides that no petition for the appointment of a guardian of a minor shall be filed in which the primary purpose of the filing is to reduce the financial resources available to the minor in order to cause the minor to qualify for public or private financial assistance from an educational institution. Provides that the court may deny such a petition if it finds that the primary purpose of the filing is to enable the minor to declare financial independence so that the minor may obtain public or private financial assistance from an educational institution or a State or federal student financial aid program.
Title
PROBATE-GUARDIAN APPOINTMENT
Sponsors
Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Bob Morgan [D] | Rep. Terra Costa Howard [D] |
Sen. Andrew Chesney [R] | Rep. Daniel Didech [D] | Rep. Jonathan Pizer [D] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-03-04 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 013-000-000 |
2020-03-04 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2020-03-04 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-000-000 |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2020-02-26 | House | To Family Law Subcommittee |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
755 | 5 | 11-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4978&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4978.htm |