IL HB4979 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children with Disabilities Article of the School Code. Provides that prior to the placement of a child in an out-of-state special education residential facility, the school district, Illinois placing agency, or court must offer to the child or the child's parent or guardian the option to place the child in a special education residential facility located within this State that provides treatment and services comparable to those provided by the out-of-state facility. Requires the school district, Illinois placing agency, or court to review annually the placement of a child in an out-of-state special education residential facility and to offer placement in a comparable facility located within this State. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-RESIDENTIAL PLACEMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 14-7.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 14-7.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4979&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4979.htm |