IL HB4999 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Downstate Police and Chicago Police Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that for a person who first becomes a police officer on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act, none of the benefits provided in those Articles shall be paid to any person who is convicted of any felony (instead of any felony relating to or arising out of or in connection with his or her service as a police officer). Provides that none of the benefits provided for in those Articles shall be paid to any person who otherwise would receive a survivor benefit who is convicted of any felony (instead of any felony relating to or arising out of or in connection with his or her service as a police officer) if the benefit results from the service of a police officer who first becomes a police officer on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Makes conforming and other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-FELONY FORFEITURE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2020-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 3-147 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 5-227 | Amended Code | Citation Text |