IL HB5008 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-31 - Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary E. Flowers
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-31 - Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary E. Flowers
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that in case of records that are not subject to automatic expungement, includes a felony or any misdemeanor adjudication (rather than only a Class B misdemeanor, Class C misdemeanor adjudication) for which a person may petition the court at any time for expungement of juvenile law enforcement records and juvenile court records relating to the incident.
Title
JUV CT-JUV EXPUNGEMENT-FELONY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-31 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2020-08-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 405 | 5-915 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5008&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5008.htm |