IL HB5009 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Community Emergency Services and Support Act. Provides that every unit of local government that provides emergency medical services for individuals with physical health needs must also provide appropriate emergency response services to individuals experiencing a mental or behavioral health emergency. Amends the Emergency Telephone System Act to make conforming changes.
Title
EMERGENCY MNTL HLTH CARE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2020-09-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2020-08-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Mental Health Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2020-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 750 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5009&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5009.htm |