IL HB5010 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-12 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-12 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Eliminates extended term sentences. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code and the Criminal Code of 2012 to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
ELIMINATES EXTENDED TERM
Sponsors
Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Kambium Buckner [D] | Rep. Nicholas Smith [D] |
Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Rep. Anne Stava-Murray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2020-08-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2020-07-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 6-303 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 10-9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-3.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 9-3.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-4.5-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-4.5-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-4.5-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-4.5-35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-4.5-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-4.5-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-5-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-5-3.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-5-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-8-2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5010&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5010.htm |