IL HB5036 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Gambling Act. Provides that the Illinois Gaming Board's powers to exclude an individual from a gambling facility includes excluding an individual from video gaming and sports wagering. Requires the Board to publish on its website a list of all individuals excluded. Requires the Board to implement a voluntary self-exclusion program whereby a person who acknowledges that he or she has a gambling problem may self-identify and self-exclude himself or herself from all gaming activities, including video gaming and sports wagering. Provides the Board rulemaking authority, including emergency rules, to implement the provisions, including procedures by which an individual may remove himself or herself from the exclusion or self-exclusion list. Makes conforming changes in the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act.
Title
GAMING-IL GAMING BOARD
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Rita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
230 | 10 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 100 | 5-45.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5036&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5036.htm |