IL HB5037 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Gambling Act. Makes changes to the information the Illinois Gaming Board requires from applicants and licensees. Provides that a qualifying owners licensee may obtain up to the maximum of 2,000 additional gaming positions at any time. Provides that payment for additional gaming positions may be made on a monthly basis, subject to payment schedules specified by the Board. Removes language requiring an owners licensee to reserve gaming positions within 30 days of the effective date of Public Act 101-31, with a 30-day extension approved by the Board. Provides that the Board shall file its report concerning the business enterprise program no later than July 1 of each year (rather than March 1). Provides that an applicant for a suppliers license that holds a specified license under the Video Gaming Act shall not be subject to additional Board investigations as a condition for licensure, except by vote of the Board. Makes conforming changes in and further amends the Video Gaming Act. Allows the Board to impose a fee to an establishment authorized to conduct video gaming under the Act or a terminal operator to cover the costs of operating the central communications system. Makes other changes.
Title
GAMING-IL GAMING BOARD
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Rita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
230 | 10 | 5.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 10 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 10 | 7.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 10 | 7.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 10 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 40 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 40 | 80 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5037&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5037.htm |