IL HB5065 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Video Gaming Act. Provides that imposing fees on an establishment authorized to conduct video gaming and on terminal operators is an exclusive power and function of the State. Prohibits a unit of local government with a population under 2,000,000 from applying any additional tax on net terminal income. Provides that a unit of local government (rather than a non-home rule unit of government) may not impose a fee for the operation of a video gaming terminal in excess of $100 per year (rather than $25). Provides that any unit of local government imposing a fee for the operation of a video gaming terminal in excess of $100 on or before January 1, 2020 may retain its fee structure but may not increase fees beyond the limit provided in the provisions. Provides that a home rule unity may not regulate the provisions in a manner inconsistent with the provisions. Effective immediately.
Title
VIDEO GAMING-LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Rita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
230 | 40 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 40 | 60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 40 | 65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5065&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5065.htm |