IL HB5076 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Board of Higher Education Act. Subject to appropriation, requires the Board of Higher Education to select 6 institutions of higher education to participate in a pilot program to provide assistance to students experiencing homelessness and to students who were in the foster care system when they graduated from high school. Provides that the institutions of higher education chosen to participate in the pilot program must provide certain accommodations to these students, may establish plans to develop surplus property for affordable housing to accommodate the needs of these students, and shall leverage existing community resources by making available to these students information that is available for individuals experiencing homelessness. Provides for the reporting of information and data. Provides that the pilot program shall expire on July 1, 2025, and repeals the pilot program provisions on January 1, 2026. Effective January 1, 2021.
Title
BD HIGHER ED-HOMELESS STUDENTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5076&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5076.htm |