IL HB5088 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Fish and Aquatic Life Code. Allows the holder of a scientific collector's permit to fish with sport fishing devices without a license. Requires any individual who is required to obtain a license to also obtain an aquatic conservation stamp prior to taking or attempting to take any fish, including minnows for commercial purposes, turtles, mussels, crayfish, or frogs from waters of this State. Provides that the fee for the aquatic conservation stamp is $5 for both resident and non-resident licensees; waives the fee for residents over 75 years of age. Makes other conforming changes. Requires that fees derived solely from the sale of aquatic conservation stamps, gifts, donations, grants, and bequests of money for the conservation of aquatic life shall be deposited to the State Treasury and set apart in a special fund known as the Aquatic Conservation Stamp Fund. Sets forth further requirements regarding appropriations from the Aquatic Conservation Stamp Fund. Effective January 1, 2021.
Title
FISH-AQUATIC STAMPS & LICENSE
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Rita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
515 | 5 | 1-230 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
515 | 5 | 20-110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
515 | 5 | 20-115 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
515 | 5 | 20-12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
515 | 5 | 20-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
515 | 5 | 20-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
515 | 5 | 20-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
515 | 5 | 20-52 | New Code | See Bill Text |
515 | 5 | 20-55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5088&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5088.htm |