IL HB5169 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that, beginning January 1, 2022, a store may not sell or distribute in this State a disposable food service container that is composed in whole or in part of polystyrene foam. Directs the Environmental Protection Agency to adopt rules to implement the amendatory Act's provisions.
Title
EPA-POLYSTYRENE FOAM BAN
Sponsors
Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz [D] | Rep. Anna Moeller [D] | Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Rep. Bob Morgan [D] |
Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Rep. Jonathan Pizer [D] | Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2020-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2020-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5169&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5169.htm |