IL HB5183 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Change of Name Article of the Code of Civil Procedure. Replaces existing language prohibiting persons with certain criminal convictions from petitioning for a name change with language providing that: a person who has been convicted of any offense for which a person is required to register under the Sex Offender Registration Act, the Murderer and Violent Offender Against Youth Registration Act, or the Arsonist Registration Act and who has not been pardoned is not permitted to file a petition for a name change during the period that the person is required to register, unless that person verifies under oath that the petition for the name change is due to marriage, transgender status, religious beliefs, or status as a victim of trafficking; and a person who has been convicted of a felony and whose sentence has not been completed or discharged is not permitted to file a petition for a name change in the courts of this State unless that person is pardoned for the offense. Provides that a person will not face a felony charge if the person's request for legal name change is denied without proof of perjury. Requires a warning to appear on a name change petition describing the penalties for seeking a prohibited name change. Makes various changes to the criteria for objections by a State's Attorney to a name change petition. Provides that a court may order that the record of the name change proceeding be designated confidential and waive the publication requirement if the court finds good cause for entering the order. Makes other changes. Makes conforming changes in the Arsonist Registration Act, the Sex Offender Registration Act, and the Murderer and Violent Offender Against Youth Registration Act.
Title
CIV PRO-NAME CHANGE-VARIOUS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2020-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 148 | 65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 150 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 154 | 60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 21-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 21-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 21-102.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 21-103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5183&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5183.htm |