IL HB5187 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the African-American HIV/AIDS Response Act. Provides that the Act may be cited as the African-American and Latinx HIV/AIDS Response Act. Throughout the Act, refers to Latinxs in conjunction with African-Americans. Amends the State Finance Act. Changes the name of the African-American HIV/AIDS Response Fund to the African-American and Latinx HIV/AIDS Response Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
HIV/AIDS RESPONSE-LATINX
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-12 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2020-03-17 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.666 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 303 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 303 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 303 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 303 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 303 | 27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 303 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 303 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5187&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5187.htm |