IL HB5191 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-10 - Fiscal Note Filed
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-10 - Fiscal Note Filed
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Intergenerational Poverty Act. Requires the Department of Human Services, subject to appropriations, to establish and maintain a data system to track intergenerational poverty. Requires the data system to have the ability to: (1) identify groups that have a high risk of experiencing intergenerational poverty; (2) identify incidents, patterns, and trends that explain or contribute to intergenerational poverty; and (3) gather and track available local, State, and national data on poverty and child poverty rates and other related information. Requires the Department to perform certain duties, including using the collected data to track intergenerational poverty. Establishes the Interagency Workgroup on Poverty and Economic Insecurity to analyze the collected information and data in order to: (i) understand the root causes of poverty and economic insecurity; (ii) identify children who are at risk of continuing in the cycle of poverty absent intervention; and (iii) implementing data-driven policies and programs that address poverty, education, economic development, and other areas as needed to measurably reduce the incidence of child poverty. Requires the workgroup to issue and publicly post an annual report on actions taken to eliminate poverty and economic insecurity in the State and other matters. Establishes the Commission on Poverty Elimination and Economic Security. Requires the Commission to develop and adopt a strategic plan, no later than November 30, 2020, to address poverty and economic insecurity in the State. Contains provisions concerning the membership on the Commission and reporting requirements. Effective immediately.
Title
INTERGENERATIONAL POVERTY ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-10 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5191&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5191.htm |