IL HB5230 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that an individual or group policy of accident and health insurance that is amended, delivered, issued, or renewed on or after January 1, 2021 shall cover a medically necessary hypofractionated proton therapy protocol to deliver a biological effective dose by paying the same aggregate amount as would be paid for the delivery of the same biological effective dose with a standard radiation therapy protocol delivered with intensity modulated radiation therapy for the same indication if specified conditions are satisfied. Provides standards concerning the aggregate amount chargeable to or payable by an eligible patient for a covered course of hypofractionated proton therapy. Provides that proton therapy coverage may not impose an annual deductible, coinsurance, or other cost-sharing limitation that is greater than that required for radiation therapy and other similar benefits within the insurance policy or contract. Defines terms. Effective January 1, 2021.
Title
INS CD-PROTON THERAPY COVERAGE
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Unes [R] | Rep. Deborah Conroy [D] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Rep. Andre Thapedi [D] |
Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Rep. Mark Batinick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | To Health Insurance Subcommittee |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael D. Unes |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5230&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5230.htm |