IL HB5247 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-19 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-19 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Changes the repeal date for provisions authorizing natural gas surcharges to provide for recovery of costs associated with investments in qualifying infrastructure plants from December 31, 2023 to January 1, 2021.
Title
UTILITIES-SURCHARGE REPEAL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2020-08-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2020-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2020-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2020-02-18 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joyce Mason |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 9-220.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5247&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5247.htm |