IL HB5268 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Includes various fentanyl analogs in the list of Schedule I controlled substances.
Title
CONTROLLED SUB-FENTANYL-ANALOG
Sponsors
Sen. John Connor [D] | Rep. Deborah Conroy [D] | Rep. Terra Costa Howard [D] | Rep. Martin Moylan [D] |
Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John Connor |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 570 | 204 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5268&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5268.htm |