IL HB5270 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Law Enforcement Officer-Worn Body Camera Act. Provides that recordings made with the use of an officer-worn body camera must be made available upon request to personnel of the law enforcement agency, the local State's Attorney, and any persons depicted in the recordings (rather than are not subject to disclosure under the Freedom of Information Act, except in limited circumstances). Provides that procedures for distribution of the recordings must include safeguards to protect the identities of individuals who are not the subjects of the encounter.
Title
OFFICER WORN CAM-DISCLOSURE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2020-03-03 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John Connor |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 706 | 10-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5270&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5270.htm |