IL HB5320 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-7)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Debt Settlement Consumer Protection Act. Adds student loan borrowers to the definition of "consumer". Adds to the definition of "debt settlement provider" any person or entity engaging in, or holding itself out as engaging in, or any person who solicits for or acts on behalf of such person or entity engaging in or holding itself out as engaging in, the business of student loan debt relief services in exchange for any fee or compensation assessed against or charged to a consumer. Excludes institutions of higher education from the definition of "debt settlement provider". Defines other terms. Requires a specified notice and disclosure to student loan borrowers to be included in advertising and marketing communications concerning student loan debt relief services. Requires providers of student loan debt relief services to provide a specified notice and disclosure before a student loan borrower signs a contract. Provides that any fees charged to a student loan borrower in exchange for student loan debt relief shall comply with a provision concerning fees. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
STUDENT LOAN DEBT RELIEF
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 429 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 429 | 105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 429 | 115 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 429 | 125 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5320&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5320.htm |