IL HB5379 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Humane Care for Animals Act and the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person is immune from criminal liability for criminal damage to property and criminal trespass to vehicles resulting from his or her forcible entry into a vehicle and from civil liability for property damage if the person: (1) determines the vehicle is locked or there is otherwise no reasonable method for a dog or cat to exit the vehicle; (2) has a good faith belief that forcible entry into the vehicle is necessary because the dog or cat is in imminent danger of suffering harm if not immediately removed from the vehicle, and based upon the circumstances known to the person at the time, the belief is a reasonable one; (3) has made a good faith effort to contact a 9-1-1 emergency telephone system operator, law enforcement, or the fire department, and if contact is not possible prior to forcibly entering the vehicle, the person makes contact as soon as possible after forcibly entering the vehicle; (4) makes a good a faith effort to place a notice on the vehicle's windshield with the person's contact information, the reason entry was made, the location of the dog or cat, and the fact that authorities have been notified; (5) remains with the dog or cat in a safe location until law enforcement or emergency responders arrive; and (6) uses no more force than necessary to enter the vehicle to remove the dog or cat. Effective immediately.
Title
IMMUNITY-DOG & CAT-LOCKED CAR
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terri Bryant |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
510 | 70 | 7.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
720 | 5 | 21-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 21-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5379&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5379.htm |