IL HB5383 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Community College Act. Establishes the workforce education strategic plan committee to: (1) study the requirements for awards, grants, or scholarships of federal or State college and career funding programs; (2) review the postsecondary courses of study for which funding may be awarded; (3) determine whether the courses of study for which funding may be awarded include programs that award diplomas, technical certificates, industry recognized certifications, credentials, or degrees, other than a baccalaureate degree, or an apprenticeship program; and (4) submit to the Governor and the General Assembly an annual strategic plan with recommendations related to its findings. Contains provisions relating to committee membership, meetings, and administrative support. Repeals the provisions on January 1, 2027.
Title
WORKFORCE EDUCATION COMMITTEE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2020-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2020-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael T. Marron |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5383&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5383.htm |