IL HB5400 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Child Care Act of 1969. Provides that "day care center" does not include certain programs or portions of programs that serve children who shall have attained the age of 2 years (rather than 3 years). Makes conforming changes.
Title
CHILD CARE ACT-DAY CARE
Sponsors
Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth [D] | Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin [D] | Rep. Katie Stuart [D] | Rep. Monica Bristow [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2020-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 10 | 2.09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5400&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5400.htm |