IL HB5403 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Civil No Contact Order Act. Provides that a petition for a civil no contact order may be filed by a family or household member of a victim of a murder. Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that a civil no contact order in a case involving a family or household member of a victim of a murder may be entered in conjunction with a delinquency petition or a criminal prosecution.
Title
PROTECT ORDER-MURDER VICTIMS
Sponsors
Rep. David Welter [R] | Rep. Grant Wehrli [R] | Rep. Patrick Windhorst [R] | Rep. Amy Grant [R] |
Rep. Terra Costa Howard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2020-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2020-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David A. Welter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 5 | 112A-2.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 22 | 201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5403&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5403.htm |