IL HB5406 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person commits criminal street gang recruitment when he or she recruits, solicits, or induces another person to join or remain a member of a criminal street gang. Provides that the penalty is a Class 4 felony. Provides that if the person recruited, solicited, or induced is a minor, the offense is a Class 3 felony. Defines "criminal street gang".
Title
CRIM CD- GANG RECRUITMENT
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Ugaste [R] | Rep. Grant Wehrli [R] | Sen. Terri Bryant [R] | Rep. Amy Grant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2020-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2020-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Ugaste |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 12-6.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5406&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5406.htm |