IL HB5442 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Health Care Affordability Act. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services, in consultation with the Department of Insurance, to conduct a feasibility study to explore options to make health insurance more affordable for Illinois residents. The study shall follow best practices by other states to establish an Illinois-specific actuarial and economic analysis of demographic and market dynamics. Provides that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services, in consultation with the Department of Insurance, shall develop and submit a proposal to the General Assembly and the Governor concerning the design, costs, benefits, and implementation of a State option for health care coverage that leverages existing State infrastructure.
Title
HEALTH CARE AFFORDABILITY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2020-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |