IL HB5465 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-13 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-13 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Housing is Recovery Pilot Program Act. Creates the Housing is Recovery Pilot Program within the Division of Mental Health of the Department of Human Services. Provides that the Program shall provide bridge rental subsidies for individuals at high risk of unnecessary institutionalization and individuals at high risk of overdose for purposes of stabilizing their mental illness or substance abuse disorder. Provides criteria for the award, computation, and payment of bridge rental subsidies. Sets forth the responsibilities of persons receiving from bridge rental subsidies. Provides for the identification and referral to the Program of persons eligible to receive bridge rental subsidies prior to their discharge from a hospital or release from a correctional facility. Provides standards for housing service providers, long-term housing, and temporary rental units. Provides that the Department will contract with an independent outside research organization to evaluate the Program's effectiveness, and shall report the results of the evaluation to the General Assembly after 5 years. Provides rulemaking authority. Defines terms. Effective immediately.
Title
HOUSING IS RECOVERY PILOT PROG
Sponsors
Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] | Rep. Deborah Conroy [D] | Rep. Monica Bristow [D] | Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] |
Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] | Rep. Ryan Spain [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2020-03-03 | House | Assigned to Mental Health Committee |
2020-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2020-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5465&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5465.htm |