IL HB5469 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Natural Resources (Conservation) Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department shall establish the Outdoor Equity Grants Program, subject to adequate appropriation or private funding, to increase the ability of underserved and at-risk populations to participate in outdoor environmental educational experiences at State parks and other public lands where outdoor environmental education programs take place. Contains provisions relating to the organization of the grant program, priority of specified populations, funding of the grant program, and annual reporting. Provides that the Department shall adopt rules to implement the provisions. Amends the State Finance Act by adding the Outdoor Equity Grants Program Fund.
Title
DNR-OUTDOOR GRANTS PROGRAM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 805 | 805-233 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 5.930 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5469&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5469.htm |