IL HB5497 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Geolocation Privacy Protection Act. Provides that a private entity that owns, operates, or controls a location-based application on a user's device may not disclose geolocation information from a location-based application to a third party unless the private entity first receives the user's affirmative express consent after providing a specified notice to the user. Sets forth the purposes for which disclosure may be made. Provides that a violation of the Act constitutes an unlawful practice for which the Attorney General may take appropriate action under the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Provides that the Act does not modify, limit, or supersede the operation of any other Illinois law or prevent a party from otherwise seeking relief under the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that waiver of the provisions of the Act is void and unenforceable and an agreement that does not comply with the Act is void and unenforceable. Providers that the Act does not apply to certain entities.
Title
GEOLOCATION PRIVACY PROTECTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee |
2020-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5497&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5497.htm |