IL HB5498 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that the Department of Insurance and the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall each appoint a Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Parity Compliance Officer to assist with the responsibilities of enforcing the requirements of the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that group accident and health policies providing coverage for hospital or medical treatment or services for illness on an expense-incurred basis shall provide specified coverage for the diagnosis and medically necessary treatment of mental, emotional, nervous, or substance use disorders or conditions. Provides criteria and standards for the types of treatment that constitute medically necessary treatment of mental, emotional, nervous, or substance use disorders or conditions. Provides that an insurer shall not limit benefits or coverage for chronic or pervasive mental, emotional, nervous, or substance use disorders or conditions to short-term treatment or to alleviating current symptoms. Provides that insurers shall perform specified actions to ensure the proper use of medical necessity criteria. Provides that if medically necessary services for mental, emotional, nervous, or substance use disorders or conditions are not available in-network within the geography and timeliness standards, the insurer must cover out-of-network services. Provides that if the Department of Insurance determines that an insurer has failed to meet the requirements of the amendatory Act, it shall impose a penalty per product line with respect to each beneficiary. Makes other changes.
Title
INS CD-MENTAL HEALTH COVERAGE
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Conroy [D] | Rep. Terra Costa Howard [D] | Rep. Grant Wehrli [R] | Rep. Jonathan Pizer [D] |
Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz [D] | Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Rep. Will Guzzardi [D] | Rep. Gregory Harris [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2020-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Mental Health Committee |
2020-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 370c | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5498&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5498.htm |