IL HB5525 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that the Department of Insurance shall: provide information to the public on the access to insurance for a living organ donor; and make any received materials related to live organ donation from a recognized live organ procurement organization available to the public. Amends the Illinois Anatomical Gift Act. Provides that a person with a physical or mental disability is not required to demonstrate postoperative independent living abilities in order to have access to a transplant if there is evidence that the person will have sufficient, compensatory support and assistance. Provides that if the Secretary of State receives materials related to live organ donation from a recognized live organ procurement organization, the Secretary shall make the materials available to the public. Provides that the Secretary may seek and accept gifts, grants, or donations from private or public sources. Makes other changes.
Title
ORGAN DONATIONS-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Rep. Nathan Reitz [D] | Rep. Deborah Conroy [D] | Rep. Monica Bristow [D] | Rep. Katie Stuart [D] |
Sen. Terri Bryant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-03 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Nathan D. Reitz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 155.46 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 50 | 4.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 50 | 5-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 50 | 5-47 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5525&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5525.htm |